Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Linda Hite, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case represented by Degasperis, John Arthur, against Aldi, Inc., represented by Borbon, Carmen Luisa, Moran, Thomas John, Stonberg, Michael L, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Christi J Acker presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: November 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 18, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: November 10, 2021NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: November 10, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: October 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 29, 2022NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY
Date: July 06, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 02, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: October 18, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 06, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2) Exhibit H-Pl Response to our D&I Notice
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2) Exhibit F- Pl response to Various Notices
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2) Exhibit K- Ltr to P re Vassar Brothers AZ 9-13-22
Date: November 09, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 29, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 05, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 04, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: February 15, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 05, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Adjournment of Conference |
||
January 04, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 06, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) Good Faith Letter |
||
December 06, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q (Motion #2) Notice for D&I |
||
November 29, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Request for Adjournment of Conference |
||
November 29, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
November 29, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2) Attorney Affirmation |
||
November 29, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.