Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Jane Doe - 19240, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Milbauer, Seth, against County Of Dutchess, The Children'S Home Of Poughkeepsie, represented by Gasparini, Louis U, Loftus, Carolyn Ann, Pitcoff, Kenneth E, Rosedale, Rebecca June, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts with Maria G Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMaria G Rosa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Child Victims Act |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 20, 2021RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 20, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: April 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: April 20, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: April 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 21, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 26, 2021EXPARTE ORDER - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: April 20, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 30, 2021SUPPORTING PLEADINGS
Date: June 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 10, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: June 10, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: August 01, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 23, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: November 19, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 09, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 18, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: January 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
||
January 09, 2023 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE including post - ebt demand |
||
November 23, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER NOI DUE DATE EXTENSION |
||
November 10, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: DEMAND FOR PRODUCTION OF INSURANCE AGREEMENTS |
||
November 10, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 09, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER CPLR 3216 ORDER - CERTIFICATION |
||
August 04, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 01, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 22, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 19, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.