Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Bessie Gonzalez, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Dutchess County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 20, 2019 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions83 days |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseDutchess County Supreme Court |
JUDGMENT
Date: May 15, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2019SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 20, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT As entered by County Clerk |
|
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | |
February 11, 2020 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | |
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING MAILED 1/17/20 |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.