Case Last Refreshed: 4 hours ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Rasmussen, David L, Rogers, Heather C, against And John Doe And Mary Doe,, Board Of Managers Of Chelsea Cove Homes On Sylvan Lake Condominium Two, Bureaus Investment Group No. 6 Llc, Capital One Bank, Douglas Smith, (total of 9) See All represented by Forman, Terry Scott, Hughes, Adam Michael, Lagumina, John J, Smith, Colin David, Zebrowski, Kathleen A, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Maria G. Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedMay 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time607 days |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 10, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 29, 2018ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: August 22, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 24, 2018CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: October 11, 2017FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: September 18, 2017FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: September 18, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 16, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 30, 2017OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: February 15, 2017ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 08, 2017RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 08, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 06, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 23, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2017NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 20, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 13, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2017CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 30, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2017NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 30, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 29, 2018 | Docket Event | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | |
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) AOS |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1) ORDER TO DISCONT. |
|
July 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) MOTION |
|
October 11, 2017 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS FORM | |
September 18, 2017 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | |
May 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT Military Status Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.