Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
United Auto Credit Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Connors, Mary Mcauley, Tompsett, Kevin W, against Eugene E. Tebordo Jr., in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Dutchess County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions71 days |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
|
Filing Court HouseDutchess County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time75 days |
JUDGMENT
Date: March 15, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 11, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 11, 2016JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 11, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 11, 2016AFFIRMATION
Date: March 11, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 21, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT Statement for Judgment entered by the County Clerk on 3/15/2016 |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Mailing | |
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Contract |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Statement for Judgment |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Service Invoice |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION Non-Military Affirmation |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE EUGENE E. TEBORDO, JR. |
|
January 21, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
December 31, 2015 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.