Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Santander Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Fourtner, Tracy Mckay, Hyman, Sarah Kristin, Loecher, Melissa Mary, Polowy, Amy E., against Benfield Electric Supply Company, Inc., Dutchess County Clerk, Jane A Parente, John Doe, Richard R Parente, (total of 7) See All represented by Blackburn, Caroline Elizabeth, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Dutchess County Supreme Court with Christine A Sproat presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 05, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions215 days |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseDutchess County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time216 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: April 27, 2015EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 09, 2015MEMORANDUM
Date: April 10, 2015JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: July 08, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: July 10, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: August 05, 2015ORDER - REFERENCE (Motion #1)
Date: May 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: July 10, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 05, 2014NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)
Date: July 07, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #3) motion granted by Judge Sproat 85/15 |
|
August 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS signed by Judge Sproat 8/5/15 |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) Order of discontinuance of action and cancellation of lis pendens |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) Redacted |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) Redacted |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) notice of withdrawl |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) copy of order of reference and withdrawl |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) re-filed notice of pendency |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #3) notice of appearance |
|
July 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) Summons, Complaint, & Notice of Pendency |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.