Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mountain Brook Realty Lp, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Cronin, Sean Michael, against The Assessor, The Board Of Assessors And The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Poughkeepsie And The Town Of Poughkeepsie, represented by Barnett, Kyle William, in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County, NY, . Dutchess County, NY Superior Courts Dutchess County Supreme Court with James Brands presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames Brands Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2014 |
CategoryTax Certiorari |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions403 days |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
|
Filing Court HouseDutchess County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time416 days |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 18, 2015PETITION
Date: July 11, 2014RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 11, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: August 31, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 25, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2015 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Tax Certiorari Consent Judgment |
|
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
October 28, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | |
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Superintendent of Schools |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE County Treasurer |
|
July 21, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Town Attorney |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
PETITION 100-0540 PETITION |
|
July 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION 100-0540 RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.