Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Dutchess County. This case was filed in Dutchess County Superior Courts with Maria G. Rosa presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 09, 2015 |
CategoryTort-Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDutchess County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Settled Hon. Maria G. Rosa CONTROL (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
February 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Settled Hon. Maria G. Rosa 10:15 FPTC, 4/24/15 JS (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
February 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa 10:15 FPTC, 4/24/15 9:30 J.S. (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
August 26, 2014 | Hearing |
Held Hon. Maria G. Rosa Supreme Trial, 9:45 PTC, 4/24/15 9:30 J.S. (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
July 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa MOTION, 8/26 PTC-4/24 J.S. (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Hon. Maria G. Rosa - Motions Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned Hon. Maria G. Rosa MOTION, 8/26 PTC, 4/24/15 JS (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
July 16, 2014 | Motion |
Judgment - Summary (Motion #001) Decided: 07/29/2014Closed Before Justice: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
April 28, 2014 | Hearing |
Held Hon. Maria G. Rosa Supreme Trial, 9:45 COMPLIANCE CONF, ERENCE (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
|
February 27, 2014 | Hearing |
Held Hon. Maria G. Rosa Supreme Trial, 9:45 COMPLIANCE CONF, ERENCE (Conversion) Judge: Rosa, Hon. Maria G. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.