Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Misty Hollow Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Schroder, Michael T, against The Board Of Assessors And The Board Of Assessment Review Of The Town Of Andes, represented by Merzig, David Scott, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 21, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Misty Hollow LLC against the Board of Assessors and the Board of Assessment Review of the Town of Andes in Delaware County, New York. The petitioner, Misty Hollow LLC, alleges that they are a taxpayer of th...
ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 21, 2023PETITION
Date: July 21, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: July 21, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 21, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 19, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) Scheduling Order signed 10/18/2023 - NOi due 9/27/2024 |
||
August 04, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20233 Aff. of Svc. SD & Treas. |
||
August 02, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Assessor Affidavit |
||
July 25, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
July 21, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE 20233 RJI Aff |
||
July 21, 2023 |
PETITION 20233 Petition |
||
July 21, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) *Corrected* 20233 NOP |
||
July 21, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION 20233 RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.