Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Loiselle, Anna L., Weiner, David Victor, against Patricia A Sprott, represented by Niba, Jacqueline Assoh, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with John F Lambert presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 13, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 30, 2024STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: January 30, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 26, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 13, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 13, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 30, 2024 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
January 26, 2024 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Assignment Notice |
||
January 19, 2024 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
||
January 19, 2024 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1) Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1) Affidavit of Facts |
||
January 19, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) *Corrected* Notice of Motion for Summary Judgment |
||
January 19, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law |
||
January 19, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) Attorney Affirmation in Support of Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.