Case Last Refreshed: 16 hours ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Joshua J Wormuth, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts Supreme.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 11, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedMay 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Delaware Supreme Court by Sidney Federal Credit Union against Joshua J Wormuth. The plaintiff, Sidney Federal Credit Union, is a federally-chartered credit union with its principal place of business in ...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 20, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: September 13, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 08, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 08, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 20, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 08, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 08, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 09, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 08, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Affidavit in Support of Default Judgment and Military Status |
||
September 08, 2023 | Affidavit of Mailing a Copy of the Summons | ||
September 08, 2023 | Affirmation of Non-Expiration of Statute of Limitations | ||
September 08, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
September 08, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Joshua J. Wormuth |
||
August 09, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Notice of Electronic Filing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.