Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Capital One, N.A., filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Hughes, Adam Michael, against Brandie M Battaglia, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 03, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: September 14, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 03, 2023NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: August 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 14, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 14, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 dmv abstract |
||
August 01, 2023 | NOTICE RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE) | ||
July 19, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 19, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
July 03, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.