Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Sonia Campbell, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Dadey, Brenton Patrick, against Dsv Spv 2 Llc, Kaja Holdings 2 Llc, Vision Property Management Llc, represented by Drucker, Robert Michael, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with John F Lambert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn F Lambert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises Liability) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 30, 2021SUMMONS
Date: July 30, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 19, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 19, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 19, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 18, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 28, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: March 22, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 18, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 18, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 21, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 20, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 30, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 28, 2022 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
April 20, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED (Motion #1) Adjourning Motion to September 23, 2022 |
||
April 18, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) re adjournment of motion return date |
||
March 22, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
March 22, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 21, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT RJI Assignment Letter |
||
March 18, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
March 18, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
March 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Affidavits of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.