Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Sidney Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shaw, Amanda C, against Glenda M Whitehead, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with John F Lambert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn F Lambert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 14, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 14, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 14, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 30, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 16, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 14, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: January 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: December 29, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: December 29, 2021EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 29, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 29, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)
Date: January 14, 2022ORDER - AWARDING FEE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 04, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 30, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: December 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 14, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
January 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 14, 2022 | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | ||
January 04, 2022 | ORDER - AWARDING FEE (Motion #1) | ||
December 30, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT RJI Assignment Letter |
||
December 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Attorney Affidavit & Attorneys Fees Affidavit, Exhibit A-E |
||
December 29, 2021 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
December 29, 2021 | RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION | ||
December 29, 2021 | EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 29, 2021 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.