Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Burdkidz, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Allinson, Dale, Obrien, Erin A, against Board Of Assessment Review Town Of Delhi, Delhi Town Of Assessment Review, The Assessor And Or The Department Of Assessment Of The Town Of Delhi And The Board Of Assessment Revi, Town Of Delhi Assessment Review, represented by Merzig, David Scott, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 14, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 19, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 20, 2022ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 26, 2021COURT NOTICE
Date: June 01, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: August 01, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021ORDER - FINAL
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: August 01, 2022ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 22, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 30, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: July 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE *Corrected*
Date: July 13, 2021RJI (AMENDED)
Date: July 19, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION *Corrected*
Date: July 13, 2021NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: July 13, 2021PETITION *Corrected*
Date: July 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2022 |
ORDER - FINAL Order signed by Judge Burns on 8/1/2022 |
||
August 01, 2022 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) | ||
August 01, 2022 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
June 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 01, 2022 |
COURT NOTICE Filing on Behalf of - Hon. Brian D. Burns |
||
October 26, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Reassignment Order 10.22.2021 |
||
October 26, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Re-Assignment Notice |
||
September 22, 2021 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Scheduling Order signed by Judge Northrup on 9/21/2021 |
||
September 17, 2021 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) NORTHRUP, JR. (Motion Part) Judge: RICHARD D. NORTHRUP, JR. |
|
July 30, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFF OF SERVICE - SCHOOL DISTRICT - 200-255 - 2122 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.