Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Reo Trust 2017-Rpl1, U.S. Bank Trust National Association, Not In Its Individual Capacity But Solely As Owner Trustee For R, Us Bank Trust National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Komosinski, Richard F, Manfro, Jordan Jayce, Olson, Karen B., Zamenhof, Alex, against Alonna Watson, Edwin Lamb, Edwin R Lamb, Eileen Doyle, John Doe John Doe Number One Through John Doe Number Ten, (total of 10) See All represented by Reynolds, Ransom Pratt, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, NY, . Delaware County, NY Superior Courts Delaware County Supreme Court with Brian D Burns presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian D Burns Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management322 days |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2019 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseDelaware County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 11, 2019EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: August 20, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: August 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 20, 2020RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION
Date: August 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 03, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 30, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 03, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021SUMMONS (POST RJI) (AMENDED)
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-E
Date: April 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021FORECLOSURE COVID-19 CONFERENCE STATUS FORM
Date: October 28, 2020OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 06, 2020HARDSHIP DECLARATION - PROOF OF SERVICE AND AFFIDAVIT ATTESTING NO RECEIPT
Date: February 04, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 23, 2021OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: October 07, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: June 16, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 14, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: May 13, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021BILL OF COSTS
Date: September 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021HARDSHIP DECLARATION RETURNED (UNDELIVERABLE)
Date: April 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 20, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 28, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY (AMENDED)
Date: April 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 20, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 11, 2019ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 11, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 11, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021REFEREE REPORT OF SALE
Date: March 16, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 30, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 11, 2019FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: September 20, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 26, 2021ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: October 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 01, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 30, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 16, 2022 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
March 16, 2022 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 08, 2021 |
ORDER - OTHER Order Discharging Guardian ad Litem and Military Attorney, for Default Judgment, Judgment of Foreclo Order Discharging Guardian ad Litem and Military Attorney, for Default Judgment, Judgment of Foreclo ... show more |
||
October 26, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Judicial Re-Assignment Notice |
||
October 26, 2021 |
ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE Reassignment Order 10.22.2021 |
||
October 07, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
October 01, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #2) | ||
October 01, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Certificate of Merit |
||
September 20, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - K (Motion #2) 3215 affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.