Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Clarke, Elizabeth Ann, Verhagen, Jason Peter, against Susan Joy Whiting, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 20, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This complaint is a consumer credit transaction case filed by Discover Bank against Susan Joy Whiting. Discover Bank is the plaintiff, and Susan Joy Whiting is the defendant. The complaint alleges that Susan Joy Whiting entered into a credit agreemen...
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 01, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: November 13, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: November 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: November 06, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 28, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 28, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI) | ||
November 28, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 13, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
November 06, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
November 01, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTHORIZATION FORM |
||
November 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service- SUSAN JOY WHITING |
||
October 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A CARD MEMBER AGREEMENT |
||
October 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
October 20, 2023 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.