Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Linda Norbom, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Kirwan, Terry J., against Arc Cafeusa001 Llc, Cka Management Llc, represented by Allen, Susan Rachel, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 04, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Trip &Amp; Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS
Date: July 04, 2022ASSIGNED RJI
Date: November 21, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 11, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2023RJI -RE: OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 18, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: January 11, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 13, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 11, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: July 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Letter Decision and Order |
||
January 11, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C ARC Answer to Complaint |
||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint |
||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Good Faith Letter |
||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Email from Plaintiff's Cousel |
||
January 11, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
January 11, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B CKA Answer to Complaint |
||
January 03, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
November 28, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER Daniel R. Mitchell, Esq. Pro Hac Vice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.