Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Unifund Ccr Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Schwaber, Scott Evan, Sheerin, John J, against Samantha Fickett, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: August 25, 2022202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 25, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: August 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
August 25, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
August 25, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
August 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
August 25, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 17, 2022 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
March 04, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 28, 2022 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Samantha Fickett |
||
February 28, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.