Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Jefferson Capital Systems Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Damsky, Edward Jay, Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, Leiderman, Joel D, against Tiffany Stevens, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Mark G Masler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 15, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2021ASSIGNED RJI
Date: January 19, 2022ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: February 18, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 18, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 11, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)
Date: May 12, 2021202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING
Date: April 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2022AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: January 25, 2022AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 18, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
March 15, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS Redacted |
||
February 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) WITH SIGNED ORDER |
||
February 25, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
February 18, 2022 | ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT | ||
January 26, 2022 |
PROOF OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Mailing |
||
January 26, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) (Motion #1) WITH VIRTUAL HEARING INFORMATION |
||
January 25, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED) | ||
January 19, 2022 | ASSIGNED RJI |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.