Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leigh Cresham, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Centeno, David, against Marquita Cresham, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateNovember 01, 2016 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions162 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time162 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 10, 2021 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
April 17, 2017 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Corrected |
||
April 13, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
April 12, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
April 12, 2017 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
April 12, 2017 | FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW | ||
April 12, 2017 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
February 28, 2017 | RJI -RE: UNCONTESTED MATRIMONIAL ACTION | ||
February 28, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
February 28, 2017 | NOTE OF ISSUE:WITHOUT JURY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.