Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Munian, Victoria Elizabeth, against Amber Vandee, Annemarie Vandee A K A Anne Marie Vandee, John Doe, Kim L. Eldridge, Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 6) See All represented by Larkin, William F, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Case Cycle Time274 days |
EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #1X)
Date: February 28, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 18, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 29, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 18, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 06, 2016ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: March 06, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 18, 2017ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: July 05, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 06, 2016NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: October 14, 2016CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2016NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 29, 2016AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: February 28, 2017ASSIGNED RJI
Date: November 29, 2016RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: November 29, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 26, 2016ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: November 29, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: May 18, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 19, 2017SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL
Date: January 06, 2017Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2017 | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
June 30, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
June 30, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
June 28, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
May 18, 2017 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
May 18, 2017 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Filed by HLR |
||
May 18, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
May 18, 2017 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
May 18, 2017 | Motion |
ORDER FOR DISCONTINUANCE & CAN (Motion #001) Decided: 06/30/2017GRANTED Before Justice: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL Answer demanded: No Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
May 18, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #001) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.