Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joseph Wegzyn, Sharon Wegzyn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gorberg, David J., against Ford Motor Company, represented by Dobis, James S, Russell, Paul K, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management81 days |
Filing DateSeptember 01, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time238 days |
ANSWER
Date: September 16, 2016DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 16, 2016DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: September 16, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 27, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 01, 2016ANSWER
Date: September 22, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2017 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
April 27, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISCONTINUED RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
November 22, 2016 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
November 21, 2016 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Prelim. Conference) Held Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
September 22, 2016 | ANSWER | ||
September 22, 2016 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
September 22, 2016 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
September 22, 2016 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Vehicle Documentation |
||
September 22, 2016 | BILL OF PARTICULARS | ||
September 16, 2016 |
ANSWER Verified Answer |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.