Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Kimberly M Friedman, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Friedman, Kimberly, against Bryan Snowhite, Marc Settenari, Yuri Khibkin, represented by Saitta, Thomas A., in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Kevin M Dowd presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin M Dowd Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryTorts - Medical, Dental, Or Podiatrist Malpractice |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Case Cycle Time507 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 09, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: September 28, 2017ANSWER
Date: August 11, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 12, 2017ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 01, 2016ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE
Date: August 16, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2017 | Hearing |
PRE-DISMISSED DOWD (Court Activity) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
September 28, 2017 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
September 20, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #001) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
September 20, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
August 18, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #002) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
August 18, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) DOWD (Motion Part) Judge: HON. KEVIN M. DOWD |
|
August 11, 2017 | ANSWER | ||
August 11, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
August 09, 2017 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 09, 2017 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #2) affidavit of service of motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.