Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anita S. Morrison, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Yaniv, Daniel, against Curtis A. Morrison, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 22, 2016 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Uncontested |
|
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions63 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time63 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 06, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COPY REQUEST |
||
September 23, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 23, 2016 |
QUALIFIED MEDICAL CHILD SUPPORT ORDER Contains SSN |
||
September 23, 2016 |
JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK Contains SSN |
||
September 23, 2016 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Contains SSN |
||
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
CAMPBELL (Court Activity)
Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 21, 2016 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) Contains SSN |
||
September 21, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
September 20, 2016 | SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL | ||
September 08, 2016 |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL Registry Check Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.