Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cortland Regional Medical Center D B A Cortland Regional Nursing And Rehabilitation Center, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Yang-Patyi, Josephine Tze Dou, against Daniel Mulhern, Estate Of John M. Mulhern, Michael Mulhern, William Mulhern, represented by Deweese, Natanya Elia, Murphy, Liam Gorman Brenndon, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Ferris D. Lebous presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1482 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 29, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 29, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 29, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 30, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 29, 2015SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED
Date: November 17, 2015LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 29, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 29, 2015RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 29, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 08, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 05, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 02, 2015ANSWER
Date: October 13, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 19, 2019ANSWER
Date: December 02, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 18, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 19, 2019 | Hearing |
PRE-DECIDED LEBOUS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. FERRIS D. LEBOUS |
|
February 19, 2019 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
June 18, 2018 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
May 30, 2018 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 29, 2017 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 09, 2017 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED FROM IAS JUSTICE LEBOUS (Court Activity) Judge: HON. FERRIS D. LEBOUS |
|
May 26, 2016 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
December 02, 2015 | ANSWER | ||
November 17, 2015 |
SUBPOENA - SO ORDERED Judicial Subpoena Duces Tecum |
||
November 13, 2015 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #001) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.