Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Merrick Bank Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Flynn, Gerald W, Sheerin, John J, against Lisa A Pittsley, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2014 |
CategoryConsumer Credit (Card) Transaction Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
Case Cycle Time405 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 30, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 30, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2015 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | ||
October 23, 2015 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 21, 2015 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 15, 2015 | 202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING | ||
April 10, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS | ||
April 10, 2015 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR | ||
February 06, 2015 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE LISA A PITTSLEY |
||
October 30, 2014 |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT LISA A PITTSLEY |
||
October 30, 2014 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING SHEERIN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.