Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Federal National Mortgage Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Augustin, Hans Henry, Bussi, Nicholas C., Polowy, Amy E., Rudroff Lavis, Amanda Carol, Vargas, Stephen John, (total of 6) See All against Chesapeake Appalachia, Llc, Dakin T. Sharum, John Doe, Kelly R. Sharum, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. As Nominee For Phh Mortgage Corp, (total of 5) See All represented by Roth, Gerald C, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Phillip R Rumsey presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePhillip R Rumsey Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management989 days |
Filing DateOctober 15, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions798 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time798 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 03, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: November 03, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 15, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 06, 2016NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 06, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 06, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 06, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 03, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 06, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: April 06, 2016ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: May 27, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: December 14, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 28, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: November 03, 2016JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: December 21, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2017 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
June 30, 2017 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Prelim. Conference) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
February 02, 2017 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
February 02, 2017 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 21, 2016 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
December 21, 2016 | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK | ||
December 21, 2016 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
PRE-JUDGEMENT RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Court Activity) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) RUMSEY, J.S.C. (Motion Part) Judge: HON. PHILLIP R. RUMSEY, J.S.C. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.