Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Successor Trustee To Bank Of America, National Association, As Successor By Merger To Lasalle Bank, N.A., As Trustee For The Mlmi Trust Series 2006-Sdi, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, Katz, Jordan S, against Cortland Regional Medical Center, Inc., E&V Energy Corporation, Jane Doe, John Doe, Joseph P. Fidler Aka Joseph Fidler, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2014 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions1262 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Case Cycle Time1308 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 15, 2017ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 08, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER - APPOINTING REFEREE
Date: July 05, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 11, 2017JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE
Date: September 26, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 10, 2016JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 11, 2017DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 12, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #4)
Date: August 24, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 26, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 26, 2014LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 09, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 28, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 02, 2016LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 26, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: August 18, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: May 10, 2017LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: December 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 24, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 28, 2016ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2017LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 10, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2017 |
OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT COVER LETTER |
||
December 21, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
November 30, 2017 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 30, 2017 | REFEREE REPORT OF SALE | ||
November 30, 2017 | FORECLOSURE ACTION SURPLUS MONIES FORM | ||
September 26, 2017 | JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND SALE | ||
September 26, 2017 | BILL OF COSTS | ||
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #004) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 26, 2017 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Held Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 22, 2017 | Hearing |
RETURN ORAL ARGUMENT (Motion #004) CAMPBELL (Motion Part) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.