Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Christopher Van Auken, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Centeno, David, against Kathryn Van Auken, in the jurisdiction of Cortland County, NY, . Cortland County, NY Superior Courts with Julie A Campbell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJulie A Campbell Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2015 |
CategoryMatrimonial |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions126 days |
Filing LocationCortland County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
|
Case Cycle Time126 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2015 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE | ||
September 29, 2015 |
JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK Contains SSN |
||
September 29, 2015 |
FINDINGS OF FACT/CONCLUSION OF LAW Contains SSN |
||
September 29, 2015 | Hearing |
POST-JUDGEMENT CAMPBELL (Court Activity) Judge: HON. JULIE A. CAMPBELL |
|
September 02, 2015 |
JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) Correct Judgment of Divorce |
||
August 18, 2015 |
SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL Corrections Needed |
||
August 01, 2015 | SUPREME COURT TRANSMITTAL | ||
August 01, 2015 | ASSIGNED RJI | ||
July 31, 2015 | JUDGMENT OF DIVORCE (PROPOSED) | ||
July 31, 2015 | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.