Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Galvan Housing Resources Inc. F K A Housing Resources Of Columbia County, Inc., Hrcc Homes, Llc, Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Hudson Ktd Limited Partnership, Hudson City Housing Development Fund Company, Inc., filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Hubbell, Daniel Taylor, Mcdonald, Christopher Michael, Zaroogian, Sean M., against Crosswinds Hudson, Llc, Hudson Ktd Limited Partnership Nominal Defendant, Wnc Housing, L.P., Wnc Institutional Tax Credit Fund X New York Series 7, L.P., represented by Clark, Jennifer Jeanne, Patterson, Steven Kelly, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 06, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Business Entity |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is a Verified Direct and Derivative Complaint filed by Galvan Housing Resources Inc., Hudson City Housing Development Fund Company, and HRCC Homes, LLC against Crosswinds Hudson, LLC, WNC Housing, L.P., and WNC Institutional Tax Credit...
EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1) *Corrected*
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 05, 2024MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: January 16, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: November 21, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6
Date: October 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: October 06, 2023SUMMONS
Date: October 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: October 06, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: October 06, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Exhibit 1 - POA and ROFR |
||
January 05, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #2) Defendants' Memo of Law in Support of Their Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) *Corrected* Affidavit of Bruce Levine |
||
January 05, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Disqualify Counsel |
||
January 05, 2024 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion to Compel Arbitration |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #2) Exhibit 2 - LPA |
||
January 05, 2024 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
January 05, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Defendants' Memo of Law in Support of Their Motion to Disqualify Counsel |
||
January 05, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Exhibit 1 - Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.