Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Village Of Chatham, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Khosrova, Mitchell, against Diana Semlear, Mark Lecuyer, represented by Hannigan, Trevor William, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Other (Vil &Amp; Build Violation) |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 27, 2022RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: December 27, 2022STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 16, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 31, 2023STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Stipulation of Settlement |
||
March 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) | ||
January 31, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 27, 2022 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT | ||
December 27, 2022 |
RJI -RE: OTHER Village & Building Law Violation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.