Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Andrew Rodrigue, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Toporowski, Matthew Austin, against Matthew Pinto, Pintotal Property Services, Inc., D B A Greenflow, represented by Better, William J., in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 20, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 18, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3. Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5. Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4. Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: March 01, 2023INTERROGATORIES
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: June 06, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 06, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 13, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: April 11, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1. Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 01, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: May 16, 2023DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 08, 2023ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: May 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 17, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 | INTERROGATORIES | ||
June 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
June 06, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Combined Demands |
||
May 24, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Comp conf 9/5/23 @ 10am; NOI 8/31/23 |
||
May 16, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
May 08, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) May 16, 2023 Conference remains on calendar |
||
April 13, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
April 11, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
March 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT 12/21/2022 Department of State AOS on Pintotal |
||
March 17, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Deed - Burnett Street |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.