Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Maria R Bruhmuller, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Howard, Michael C., against Rapkow, Ltd, represented by Dyson, Maria Kimber, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 27, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Slip And Fall) |
Last RefreshedJuly 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2022SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 27, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 02, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: December 02, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: November 17, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: December 23, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: December 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 06, 2023STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
January 06, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 23, 2022 | DEMAND FOR: | ||
December 23, 2022 | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION | ||
December 05, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
December 05, 2022 |
ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING Conf. scheduled for December 6, 2022 adjourned - In-Person Compliance Conference Scheduled for April Conf. scheduled for December 6, 2022 adjourned - In-Person Compliance Conference Scheduled for April ... show more |
||
December 02, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
December 02, 2022 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER (PROPOSED) | ||
November 17, 2022 | COURT NOTICE | ||
November 17, 2022 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Preliminary Conference Stipulation and Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.