Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Carolyn Stern, Eileen Ordu, Esther L Arias, George R Brehm Jr, John Gourlay, (total of 13) See All filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Bjelke, Anthony Robert, Shepardson, Thomas Andrew, against Clover Reach Partners Llc, Village Of Philmont, Village Of Philmont Board Of Trustees, Village Of Philmont Planning Board, represented by Fitzsimmons, Robert Jude, Freeman, Paul Martin, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 09, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 09, 2022PETITION
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 22, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: October 25, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 24, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: January 17, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: November 10, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 18, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 10, 2022ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: November 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
January 17, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
November 18, 2022 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY (Motion #1) In Support of the Petition |
||
November 18, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) RECORDINGS - Planning Board Meetings |
||
November 16, 2022 | STIPULATION - OTHER | ||
November 10, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW | ||
November 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Trail Map |
||
November 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) | ||
November 10, 2022 | ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING | ||
November 10, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.