Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Samuel A. Abady, filed a(n) Agency Action - Administrative case represented by Abady, Samuel A., against Frank Scorzello, Gary Plotch, Glenn Ganz, Joseph Simeone, Lois Lovisolo, (total of 10) See All represented by Chancellor, A G., Liotti, Lara, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts with Henry F Zwack presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2020 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 78 |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaAdministrative |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeAgency Action |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 25, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: October 15, 2020RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 25, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: August 04, 2020DEMAND FOR COMPLAINT
Date: July 15, 2020ANSWER
Date: August 24, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2020 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
October 15, 2020 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) Decision and Order with Notice of Entry |
||
August 25, 2020 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2020 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
August 25, 2020 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
August 25, 2020 | ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) | ||
August 25, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Verified Answer of TSPOA |
||
August 25, 2020 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint |
||
August 24, 2020 | ANSWER | ||
August 24, 2020 | NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.