Case Last Refreshed: 1 day ago
Donald Duksa, Elizabeth Duksa, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Rappleyea, Allan B, against The Essell Farms, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Columbia County, NY, . Columbia County, NY Superior Courts Supreme with Richard Mott presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Mott Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 11, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Article 15) |
Last RefreshedApril 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseSupreme |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Donald Duksa and Elizabeth Duksa against The Essell Farms, LLC. The plaintiffs are residents of Columbia County, New York, and they are seeking to compel the determination of claims to a specific piece of r...
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 30, 2021ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT
Date: November 29, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 28, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 28, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: October 21, 2021LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 21, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 09, 2021JUDGMENT
Date: September 02, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: August 25, 2021JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: August 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 27, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: June 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 27, 2021AFFIRMATION / AFFIDAVIT OF REGULARITY
Date: July 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 11, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: June 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
November 29, 2021 |
ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT CORRECTED |
||
October 28, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Corrected Judgment |
||
October 28, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental Affirmation |
||
October 21, 2021 |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) Corrected Judgment - proposed |
||
October 21, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
September 17, 2021 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 09, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 02, 2021 |
JUDGMENT DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
||
August 25, 2021 |
AFFIRMATION Supplemental Affirmation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.