Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Columbia County. This case was filed in Columbia County Superior Courts with MICHAEL F MCGUIRE presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMICHAEL F MCGUIRE Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 01, 2014 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedSeptember 30, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationColumbia County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2015 | Hearing |
PRE-SETTLED MCGUIRE (Court Activity) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
June 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #002) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
June 08, 2015 | Hearing |
MOTION DECIDED (Motion #003) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
December 08, 2014 | Hearing |
PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE MCGUIRE (Prelim. Conference) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
November 24, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #002) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
November 24, 2014 | Hearing |
RETURN/SUBMIT (Motion #003) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
November 19, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #003) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
November 19, 2014 | Motion |
AMEND ANSWER (Motion #003) Decided: 06/08/2015WITHDRAWN Before Justice: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE Answer demanded: No Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
October 30, 2014 | Hearing |
MOTION FILED (Motion #002) MCGUIRE (Motion Part) Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
|
October 30, 2014 | Motion |
SUBSTITUTE PARTIES (Motion #002) Decided: 06/08/2015WITHDRAWN Before Justice: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE Answer demanded: No Judge: MICHAEL F MCGUIRE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.