Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Florio, Michael James, Garbus, Mark A, against Thomas E Holtsclaw, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
This legal document is a complaint filed by LVNV Funding LLC against Thomas E Holtsclaw. The complaint alleges that the defendant made purchases under a credit agreement and owes a balance of $8,347.70. The document provides information about the acc...
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 24, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: January 09, 2024AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: December 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Q38738984511 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 09, 2024 | JUDGMENT | ||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY Redacted per 22 NYCRR NON MILITARY Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR ORIGINAL CREDITOR AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR STATUTE OF LIMITATION Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted per 22 NYCRR TERMS AND CONDITIONS Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR DEBT SELLER AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR PLAINTIFF AFFIDAVIT Redacted |
||
January 08, 2024 |
JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
December 01, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.