Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
James C Monty, Jeffrey Luck, Jerika Manning, filed a(n) Special Proceedings - Election Law case represented by Ciampoli, John Joseph N, Curran, James Patrick, against Amy Asadourian Senecal, Brandi Lloyd, Clinton County Board Of Elections, Clinton County Democratic Committee, Mary Dyer, (total of 5) See All represented by Kelleher, Jacqueline Marie, Schneider, Mark A, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 19, 2023 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Election Law |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
|
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 03, 2023INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 03, 2023NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: September 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-2
Date: July 19, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 19, 2023RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: July 19, 2023PETITION
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D-1
Date: July 19, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 19, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: July 20, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: July 20, 2023ADMISSION OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 31, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 04, 2023DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2023ANSWER IN SPECIAL PROCEEDING
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: July 31, 2023ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1.)
Date: August 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 02, 2023ANSWER
Date: August 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: July 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 03, 2023 |
INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT (Motion #1) informational statement |
||
September 03, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
September 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) decision judgment order |
||
August 12, 2023 | DECISION/ORDER + JUDGMENT | ||
August 04, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
August 03, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Affidavit of Brandi Lloyd |
||
August 03, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
August 03, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 Determination |
||
August 02, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.