Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gazzo, Nicole Carol, Jurek, Amber Augustine, Pascuzzi, Ashley Marie, Polowy, Amy E., against Beth A Nichols, Brandon J. Nichols, Cavalry Spv I, Llc, As Assignee Of Synchrony Bank Formerly Known As Ge Capital Retail Bank, John Doe, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: April 17, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 21, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 21, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 21, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth Form |
||
June 12, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Amended Affidavit of Service-Brandon J. Nichols |
||
April 17, 2023 | NOTICE OF PENDENCY | ||
April 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAVALRY SPV I, LLC AOS |
||
April 14, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CAVALRY SPV I, LLC, AS ASSIGNEE OF SYNCHRONY BANK FORMERLY KNOWN AS GE CAPITAL RETAIL BANK AOS |
||
April 14, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
April 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BRANDON J NICHOLS |
||
April 13, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM |
||
April 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF 3215 MAILING / BETH A NICHOLS |
||
April 13, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE/ BETH A NICHOLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.