Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Crosscountry Mortgage, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Roth, Gerald C, against Elisabeth J. Nance, John Doe #1 Through And Including John Doe #25, The Defendants Last Named In Quotation Marks Being Intended To Designate Tenants Or Occupants In Possession Of The Herein Described Premises Or Portions Thereof, If Any There Be, Said Names Being Fictitious, Their True Name Being Unknown To Plaintiff, represented by Mcghee, Rachel Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 20, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: December 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: December 26, 2023FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM
Date: December 22, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 25, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 20, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: October 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT WITH CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: March 20, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2023 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
December 26, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 22, 2023 | FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE INTAKE FORM | ||
October 25, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
October 25, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RJI - Supporting Affidavits of Service |
||
October 20, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
October 20, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT RJI - Affidavit of Mailing |
||
October 20, 2023 |
RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE RJI - Settlement Conference |
||
July 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ELISABETH J. NANCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.