Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Resurgent Receivables Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Stiller, Craig Scott, Winograd, Ian Zev, against Thomas Brown, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 17, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 04, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 17, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 17, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: June 20, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 01, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 05, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 01, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 01, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 01, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
July 31, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
June 20, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 01, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 01, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 AFFIDAVIT OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
June 01, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
June 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF PURCHASE AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT SELLER | ||
June 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND PURCHASE OF ACCOUNT BY DEBT BUYER PLAINTIFF | ||
June 01, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIRMATION |
||
June 01, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AND SALE OF ACCOUNT BY ORIGINAL CREDITOR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.