Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Elizabeth Bazzano, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Owens, William Lewis, against Bazzbach Properties, Llc., Brent Bazzano, Cory Weidenbach, James Bazzano, William Bazzano, (total of 5) See All represented by Assaf, Michael David, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 16, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 12, 2023ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 26, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: May 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: June 06, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 06, 2023COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: June 06, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: May 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: May 23, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: March 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2023 |
REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S) Verified Reply to Counterclaims |
||
June 26, 2023 | ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S) | ||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Operating Agreement |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Written Correspondence |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Written Correspondence |
||
June 06, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Written Correspondence |
||
June 06, 2023 | COMPLAINT (AMENDED) | ||
May 23, 2023 | COMPLAINT | ||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - Operating Agreement |
||
May 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - Written Correspondence |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.