Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Ufirst Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Magguilli, Lawrence Patrick, against Adam G Rein, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 15, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 20, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 20, 2023JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 15, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 15, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 15, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 20, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: April 12, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS
Date: June 20, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 10, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: June 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 20, 2023 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
June 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
June 20, 2023 | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | ||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) FILING RECEIPT |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) FILING RECEIPT |
||
June 20, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
June 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) re: statute of limitations |
||
June 20, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) CONTRACT |
||
June 20, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
June 20, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) non-military |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.