Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Migliaccio, Anthony J, against Adrienne Derusha Aka Adrienne S Derusha, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Original Creditor Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: August 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 14, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 14, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 25, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2023AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) Agreement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: July 25, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Balance Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 25, 2023NOTICE
Date: July 25, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: July 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2023 |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #1) Request to withdraw motion which was returnable 8/7/2023 |
||
August 09, 2023 |
STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI) Redacted per 22 NYCRR Redacted per 22 NYCRR §202.5(e) |
||
July 25, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
July 25, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
July 25, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Last Payment Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR Last Payment Statement Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) S&C Redacted per 22 NYCRR S&C Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of S&C |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Non- Military Service Redacted per 22 NYCRR Affidavit of Non- Military Service Redacted |
||
July 25, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of S&C- Additional Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.