Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Jamie Menard, L. Bombardier And Sons, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Rubin, Daniel Sidney Lawrence, Watson, Bonnie Rose, against Charlene Bombardier, Louis Bombardier, represented by Meyer, Justin Robert, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Allison M. Mcgahay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAllison M. Mcgahay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2023 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedFebruary 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 20, 2023ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE - SO ORDERED
Date: November 29, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2024LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 03, 2024ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 24, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 27, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: February 24, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 27, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 24, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 25, 2023ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: March 24, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 28, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 24, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 24, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 01, 2023REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 22, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 23, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 24, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 01, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: July 20, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 13, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 11, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 31, 2024 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
January 12, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
January 05, 2024 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Complaint |
||
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service for Second Subpoena |
||
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #1) USPS Tracking for Good Faith Letter |
||
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Second Subpoena |
||
January 03, 2024 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 03, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) Good Faith Letter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.