Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Credit Acceptance Corporation, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Shur, Joseph M, against Pamela Winters Aka Pamela J Winters, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 23, 2023 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Non-Card) Transaction |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
JUDGMENT
Date: September 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: February 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: February 23, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 23, 2023JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 30, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: June 23, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: May 30, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIRMATION
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 15, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 15, 2023ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT)
Date: June 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2023 | JUDGMENT | ||
September 15, 2023 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION statue of limitations affirmation |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION Attorney affirmation of facts |
||
September 15, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT non military affidavit |
||
September 15, 2023 | affidavit of compliance | ||
June 23, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
June 20, 2023 | ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF LAWSUIT (CONSUMER CREDIT) | ||
May 30, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Pamela Winters |
||
May 30, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING EFIL AUTHO |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.