Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Jazlyn Brooks, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case represented by Kirby, Andrew Winans, against Plattsburgh Housing Authority, The City Of Plattsburgh, represented by Bernstein, Jonathan Marc, Houston, Mark Thomas, Liguori, John William, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Paul Davenport presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePaul Davenport Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Personal Injury) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 31, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: January 24, 2024ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2024COURT NOTICE
Date: January 17, 2024ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING
Date: September 13, 2023LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 12, 2023NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 26, 2023ANSWER
Date: April 26, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: August 07, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: August 07, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 28, 2023ANSWER
Date: March 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
January 17, 2024 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
January 17, 2024 | COURT NOTICE | ||
September 13, 2023 | ORDER - CASE SCHEDULING | ||
September 12, 2023 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Status Conference |
||
August 07, 2023 | NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
August 07, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
August 07, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
August 04, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
April 26, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Certificate of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.