Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Jennifer B. King, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Bukolt-Ryder, Maryanne, against Craig M. King, in the jurisdiction of Clinton County, NY, . Clinton County, NY Superior Courts with Glen Bruening presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGlen Bruening Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2023 |
CategoryMatrimonial - Contested |
Last RefreshedJune 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClinton County, NY |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Sealed |
||
March 22, 2023 |
STATEMENT OF NET WORTH Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
COURT NOTICE Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
March 16, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Sealed |
||
February 28, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT Sealed |
||
February 22, 2023 |
SWORN STATEMENT OF REMOVAL OF BARRIERS TO REMARRIAGE Sealed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.